Ulf Kristersson (Mod)
Statsminister
- Party
- The Moderate Party
- Constituency
- Södermanland County, seat 30
- Birth year
- 1963
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Off duty
The Moderate Party
Party Leader
Prime Minister's Office
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Off duty
- 2022-10-18 – 2026-9-21
- Ordinary member
- 2014-10-4 – 2022-10-18
- Off duty
- 2014-9-29 – 2014-10-3
- Ordinary member
- 1994-10-2 – 2000-4-30
Member of Parliament
- Ersättare
- 1991-10-4 – 1994-10-2
The Moderate Party
- Party Leader
- 2017-10-1 –
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy Chair
- 2014-10-7 – 2014-12-15
- Deputy member
- 1995-10-10 – 1998-10-4
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy Chair
- 2014-12-19 – 2017-10-10
- Member
- 2014-12-15 – 2014-12-18
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 1998-10-13 – 2000-4-30
- Member
- 1994-10-10 – 1998-10-4
- Deputy member
- 1991-10-7 – 1994-10-1
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 1994-10-10 – 1998-10-4
- Deputy member
- 1991-10-7 – 1994-10-1
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-10-4
Advisory Council on Foreign Affairs
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2022-10-18
- Member
- 2017-11-22 – 2022-10-2
The War Delegation
- Member
- 2022-10-11 – 2022-11-15
- Member
- 2017-12-14 – 2022-10-9
The Swedish Delegation to the Nordic Council
- Deputy member
- 2017-12-14 – 2018-10-9
Prime Minister's Office
- 2022-10-18 – 2026-9-21
The Ministry of Health and Social Affairs
- Minister
- 2010-10-6 – 2014-10-3
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Bostadsort
Stockholm
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Ledamot av Moderata samlingspartiets partistyrelse 88-92.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 91–00 och 14– (statsrådsersättare 911005–941003). Ledamot socialförsäkringsutskottet 94–00. Vice ordförande finansutskottet 14–17 och arbetsmarknadsutskottet 14. Suppleant socialförsäkringsutskottet 91–94, utbildningsutskottet 91–98 och arbetsmarknadsutskottet 95–98. Ledamot Utrikesnämnden 17–22 och krigsdelegationen 17–22. Suppleant Riksdagens revisorer 94–00. Partiledare Moderaterna 17–. Statsråd (socialförsäkringsminister), Socialdepartementet 101005–141003. Statsminister, Statsrådsberedningen 221018–.
Föräldrar
Fil.kand. Lars Kristersson och adjunkten Karin Axelsson.
Utbildning
Gymnasieexamen, S:t Eskils skola, Eskilstuna 83. Värnplikt som plutonchef, S 1, Enköping 83–84. Civilekonomexamen, Uppsala universitet 85–88.
Anställningar
Chef public affairs/informationsdirektör, Connecta/Adcore-koncernen 00–01. Kommunikationskonsult, Nextwork AB 01–02. Marknadschef, näringslivets tankesmedja Timbro 95–98.
Uppdrag inom statliga myndigheter m.m.
Ledamot, Kommittén för översyn av studiestödssystemet 95–96.
Kommunala uppdrag
Finanskommunalråd, Strängnäs 02–06. Socialborgarråd, Stockholm 06–10.
Litteratur
Klyftan mellan väljare och valda (88), Generationskriget (93, tillsammans med andra), Det socialpolitiska arvet (94), Non-working generation (94, tillsammans med annan) och Ett brutet löfte (95, tillsammans med andra).