Jasenko Omanovic (SocDem)
Tidigare riksdagsledamot
- Constituency
- Västernorrland County
- Birth year
- 1967
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2021-9-1 – 2022-9-26
- Ordinary member
- 2006-10-2 – 2018-9-24
Member of Parliament
- Alternate member
- 2018-9-24 – 2021-8-31
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
- Deputy member
- 2006-10-10 – 2010-10-4
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2019-2-27 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2014-11-25
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2014-11-25 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2012-3-23 – 2014-9-29
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2010-10-18
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Joint Committee on Foreign Affairs and Defence
- Deputy member
- 2014-11-20 – 2014-12-17
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
The Swedish delegation to the Organization for Security and Co-operation in Europe
- Member
- 2018-10-9 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-19 – 2018-9-24
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 06- (statsrådsersättare 180924-). Ledamot socialförsäkringsutskottet 10-14, utrikesutskottet 14 och trafikutskottet 14-. Suppleant socialförsäkringsutskottet 06-10, trafikutskottet 10 och 12-14, näringsutskottet 14-18, arbetsmarknadsutskottet 14-18, sammansatta utrikes- och försvarsutskottet 14 och utrikesutskottet 19-. Ledamot OSSE-delegationen 18-. Suppleant OSSE-delegationen 10-18.
Föräldrar
Geodeten Sakib Omanovic och ekonomen Bekira Omanovic, f. Dolic.
Utbildning
Gymnasium, el-teknisk linje, Banja Luka i Bosnien och Hercegovina, slutår 87.
Anställningar
Projektledare 95-98. Arbetsförmedlare 98-06.
Uppdrag inom statliga myndigheter m.m.
Ledamot i insynsrådet för Länsstyrelsen i Västernorrlands län 16-17. Styrelseledamot, Sveriges Regionala Flygplatser AB (SRF) 16-.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Härnösands kommun 02-. Ersättare, kommunstyrelsen 99-02, 1:e vice ordförande 02-06.
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Styrelseledamot, Fem-i-tolv-rörelsen.
Bostadsort
Härnösand