Jamal El-Haj
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Constituency
- City of Malmö, seat 35
- Birth year
- 1960
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2018-9-24 – 2026-9-21
Member of Parliament
- Ersättare
- 2016-6-15 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-4 – 2023-12-21
- Member
- 2020-11-13 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2020-11-13
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2016-6-28 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-4 – 2023-3-24
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2023-3-24 – 2024-2-12
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Joint Committee on Foreign Affairs and Defence
- Deputy member
- 2021-11-11 – 2021-12-15
- Deputy member
- 2021-3-18 – 2021-4-21
- Deputy member
- 2020-11-10 – 2020-12-15
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-10-4
The Swedish delegation to the Organization for Security and Co-operation in Europe
- Deputy member
- 2023-3-6 – 2023-10-27
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 16– (ersättare 160615–180924). Ledamot utrikesutskottet 20–22. Suppleant skatteutskottet 16–18, utrikesutskottet 18–20 och 22–23, sammansatta utrikes- och försvarsutskottet 20 och 21, arbetsmarknadsutskottet 22–23 och trafikutskottet 23–. Suppleant OSSE-delegationen 23.