Hans Hoff (SocDem)
Tidigare riksdagsledamot
- Constituency
- Halland County
- Title
- Ombudsman
- Birth year
- 1963
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
- hans.hoff@riksdagen.se
- Telephone
- 08-786 49 44
Current assignments
The General Council of the Riksbank
Member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 1999-10-15 – 2022-9-26
Member of Parliament
- Ersättare
- 1995-11-16 – 1998-10-5
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2006-10-10 – 2010-10-4
- Member
- 2002-10-8 – 2006-10-2
- Deputy member
- 1999-10-21 – 2002-9-30
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
- Member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 1996-9-26 – 1998-10-4
- Deputy member
- 1995-11-17 – 1996-9-16
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 1997-10-10 – 1998-10-4
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
The Riksdag Delegation to the Inter-Parliamentary Union
- Member
- 2002-12-19 – 2003-9-3
The Bank of Sweden Tercentenary Foundation
- Member
- 2004-11-1 – 2006-10-2
- Personally appointed substitute
- 2001-11-22 – 2004-10-31
Council for Members' Affairs
- Member
- 2010-10-13 – 2014-10-13
The General Council of the Riksbank
- Member
- 2022-10-11 –
- Member
- 2014-10-14 – 2022-10-9
- Member
- 2019-2-15 – 2021-12-31
- Alternate member
- 2016-1-1 – 2018-12-31
The Riksdag Board
- Alternate member
- 2012-3-23 – 2014-10-7
- Alternate member
- 2010-10-12 – 2012-3-22
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 95-98 (statssekreterarersättare 951116-981005) och 99-. Ledamot finansutskottet 02-10, konstitutionsutskottet 10-14, socialutskottet 14-18 och kulturutskottet 18-. Suppleant trafikutskottet 95-98, näringsutskottet 97-98, finansutskottet 99-02 och justitieutskottet 18-. Ledamot Interparlamentariska unionens svenska delegation 02-03, Styrelsen för Stiftelsen Riksbankens Jubileumsfond 04-06, rådet för ledamotsnära frågor 10-14 och riksbanksfullmäktige 14-. Suppleant Styrelsen för Stiftelsen Riksbankens Jubileumsfond 01-04, riksdagsstyrelsen 10-14 och riksdagens ansvarsnämnd 16-18, ledamot 19-.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Falkenberg 98-99. Ersättare, kommunstyrelsen 99. Ledamot, arbetsförmedlingsnämnden 99. Ombud, Svenska Kommunförbundets länsavdelning, Hallands län 99.