Hanna Westerén (SocDem)
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Constituency
- Gotland County, seat 11
- Title
- Utredare.
- Birth year
- 1981
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
Committee on Taxation
Member
Committee on Finance
Deputy member
Deputy Chair
The Bank of Sweden Tercentenary Foundation
Personally appointed substitute
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2018-7-16 – 2026-9-21
- Off duty
- 2017-10-9 – 2018-7-15
- Ordinary member
- 2015-2-1 – 2017-10-8
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2018-4-12 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2015-2-1 – 2018-4-12
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-10-4
- Deputy member
- 2015-10-31 – 2018-10-2
- Deputy Chair
- 2022-11-8 –
- Member
- 2022-10-26 – 2022-11-8
The War Delegation
- Member
- 2018-10-9 – 2022-10-9
The Bank of Sweden Tercentenary Foundation
- Personally appointed substitute
- 2022-11-1 –
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 15–. Ledamot näringsutskottet 18, miljö- och jordbruksutskottet 18–22 och skatteutskottet 22–. Suppleant näringsutskottet 15–18, EU-nämnden 15–18 och finansutskottet 22–. Ledamot krigsdelegationen 18–22. Ordförande, Riksdagens delegation till parlamentariska Östersjökonferensen 22–.
Föräldrar
Revisorn Gunder Nyman och undersköterskan Inga-Maj Nyman, f. Samuelsson.
Utbildning
Gymnasieskola, Visby, slutår 00. Fil.mag. europeisk historia, Högskolan på Gotland 07.
Anställningar
Försäkringskassan 01–.
Uppdrag inom statliga myndigheter m.m.
Ledamot, insynsrådet, Länsstyrelsen Gotland 11–. Ledamot, miljömålsberedningen 19–20. Suppleant, Stiftelsen Riksbankens Jubileumsfond 22–. Ledamot, BSPC 22–. Ordförande, svensk-ukrainska parlamentarikernätverket 22–.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Gotland 06–. Kommunstyrelsen, Gotland 06–14. Vice ordförande, regionstyrelsen, Gotland 10–14. Suppleant, barn- och utbildningsnämnden, Gotland 05–06, ledamot 06–10. Ledamot, gymnasie- och vuxenutbildningsnämnden, Gotland 09–10. Ordförande, socialnämnden, Gotland 11–14. Ordförande, Tryggare Gotland 11–14. Ordförande, Finsam Gotland 11–14.
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Vice ordförande, Socialdemokraterna Gotland 11–. Ledamot, partistyrelsen Socialdemokraterna 14–. Styrelseuppdrag Gråbo-Bingeby Socialdemokratiska förening 09–.