Fredrik Malm (Lib)
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Liberal Party
- Constituency
- Stockholm County, seat 27
- Title
- Förbundsordförande.
- Birth year
- 1977
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
Committee on Education
Chair
Committee on Cultural Affairs
Deputy member
Committee on Defence
Deputy member
Committee on the Constitution
Deputy member
Committee on European Union Affairs
Deputy member
Advisory Council on Foreign Affairs
Member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2014-9-29 – 2026-9-21
Member of Parliament
- Alternate member
- 2013-8-15 – 2014-9-29
- Alternate member
- 2006-10-6 – 2013-2-14
- Off duty
- 2013-2-15 – 2013-8-14
Committee on Education
- Chair
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2022-10-4
- First Deputy Chair
- 2021-9-16 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2021-9-8 – 2021-9-16
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2021-9-8
- Deputy member
- 2010-11-17 – 2014-9-29
- Member
- 2009-9-3 – 2010-2-5
- Deputy member
- 2006-10-10 – 2009-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2021-9-8
- Member
- 2018-2-15 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2014-11-5 – 2015-3-12
- Member
- 2013-9-26 – 2014-9-29
- Deputy member
- 2013-2-16 – 2013-9-25
- Member
- 2010-10-12 – 2013-2-15
- Member
- 2010-2-5 – 2010-10-4
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2015-3-6 – 2016-9-27
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2015-3-5
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2015-3-6 – 2018-1-24
- Deputy member
- 2012-10-1 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2016-9-29 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2006-10-24 – 2007-10-15
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2006-10-24 – 2010-10-4
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2014-11-5 – 2016-1-14
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2016-3-15 – 2016-9-27
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-12 – 2026-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-9 – 2022-9-26
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-12 – 2026-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Joint Committee on Foreign Affairs and Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-26 – 2020-9-13
- Deputy member
- 2018-5-15 – 2018-6-14
- Member
- 2014-4-15 – 2014-6-12
- Member
- 2012-11-27 – 2012-12-19
- Deputy member
- 2011-11-24 – 2011-12-14
- Member
- 2011-9-20 – 2011-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2011-3-31 – 2011-4-1
- Deputy member
- 2010-11-23 – 2010-12-15
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-12 –
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-9 – 2022-10-4
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2018-10-2
Advisory Council on Foreign Affairs
- Member
- 2022-11-10 –
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 06– (statsrådsersättare 061006–140929). Ledamot utbildningsutskottet 09–10, 1:e vice ordförande 21–22 och ordförande 22–. Ledamot utrikesutskottet 10–15 och 18–21, sammansatta utrikes- och försvarsutskottet 11, 12 och 14, miljö- och jordbruksutskottet 14–15 och arbetsmarknadsutskottet 15–18. Suppleant socialförsäkringsutskottet 06–07 och 16–22, kulturutskottet 06–10 och 22–, utbildningsutskottet 06–09 och 10–14, EU-nämnden 10–, arbetsmarknadsutskottet 12–14, sammansatta utrikes- och försvarsutskottet 10, 11 och 18, utrikesutskottet 13 och 14–15, trafikutskottet 14–16, miljö- och jordbruksutskottet 15–16, civilutskottet 16 och försvarsutskottet 18–. Ledamot Utrikesnämnden 22–. Ordförande riksdagsnätverket Sverige–Kurdistan 11–14.
Föräldrar
Byggnadsingenjören Göran Malm och banktjänstemannen Ann Charlotte Malm, f. Kruse.
Utbildning
Gymnasieskola, Stockholm, slutår 97. Studier vid Uppsala universitet och Stockholms universitet.
Anställningar
Ledarskribent 01–02. Förbundsordförande, LUF 02–06.
Uppdrag inom statliga myndigheter m.m.
Ledamot Migrationsverkets insynsråd 16–20. Ledamot, parlamentariska kommittén för en framtida hållbar migrationspolitik 19–20.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Stockholms kommun 02–06. Ersättare, utbildningsnämnden 98–02, ledamot 06. Ledamot, intagningsdelegationen 98–02, integrationsnämnden 02–05 och arbetsmarknads-integrationsberedningen 03–06.
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Styrelseledamot, LUF Söder om söder 95. Styrelseledamot, Folkpartiet i Skarpnäck 97–99 och Kungsholmen 05–06. Styrelseledamot, LUF Storstockholm 95–99. Vice förbundsordförande, Liberala Ungdomsförbundet 99–02 och förbundsordförande 02–06. Styrelseledamot, Samfundet Sverige-Israels riksstyrelse 06–08, ordförande i Stockholmssektionen 06–09. Kyrkofullmäktig, Skarpnäck 97–00. Ledamot, Svenska kommittén mot antisemitism 05–08. Medarbetare, tidskriften Expo 99–02. Styrelseledamot, Folkpartiet Stockholms län 10–13. Vice ordförande, Liberalerna Stockholms kommun 15–21. Styrelseledamot, Swedish International Liberal Centre (Silc) 11–.
Litteratur
Naftasyndikat – berättelsen om direktör Kruse och Stalins oljebolag i Sverige (20).
Said and done
Here you will find what the member has said and done in the Riksdag. This can apply to motions, speeches in the chamber or interpellations and written questions to the government. Here you will also find what the government's ministers have said and done in the Riksdag. Use the filters to find among the documents.
Presidentvalet i Azerbajdzjan
Skriftlig fråga 2013/14:34 av Malm, Fredrik (FP)
den 4 oktober Fråga 2013/14:34 Presidentvalet i Azerbajdzjan av Fredrik Malm FP till utrikesminister Carl Bildt M Den 9 oktober hålls presidentval i Azerbajdzjan. Landet styrs av en auktoritär regim som kränker yttrandefrihet och mänskliga rättigheter. I Utrikesdepartementets rapportering om Azerbajdzjan nämns att- Inlämnad
- 2013-10-04
- Besvarare
- Carl Bildt (M)