Dennis Dioukarev (SweDem)
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Sweden Democrats
- Constituency
- City of Göteborg, seat 98
- Title
- Ekonomie studerande.
- Birth year
- 1993
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
Committee on Finance
Member
The War Delegation
Member
The Bank of Sweden Tercentenary Foundation
Member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2014-9-29 – 2026-9-21
Committee on Finance
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2019-6-18
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-14 – 2018-9-24
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-10-4
The War Delegation
- Member
- 2022-10-11 –
The Bank of Sweden Tercentenary Foundation
- Member
- 2022-11-1 –
The Swedish Delegation to the Nordic Council
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-10-9
The General Council of the Riksbank
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-14 – 2014-10-23
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Ledamot, förbundsstyrelsen SDU, 13–14. Ordförande, Sverigedemokraterna Kronoberg 14–15. Vice ordförande, Ungsvenskarna 15–16. Suppleant partistyrelsen Sverigedemokraterna 21–.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 14–. Ledamot finansutskottet 14–. Suppleant skatteutskottet 14–19. Ledamot krigsdelegationen 22–. Suppleant Nordiska rådets svenska delegation 14–16 och Riksbanksfullmäktige 14. Vice ordförande styrelsen för Riksbankens jubileumsfond 22–.
Utbildning
Gymnasieskola, Göteborg, slutår 12. Civilekonomprogrammet, Linnéuniversitetet, 12–14. Studier på kandidatprogrammet i företagsekonomi, Stockholms universitet.
Anställningar
Ekonomiassistent, privat sektor, 13–14. Valorganisatör, Sverigedemokratisk ungdom 14.
Uppdrag inom statliga myndigheter m.m.
Ledamot, Riksbankskommittén 16–. Betalningsutredningens parlamentariska referensgrupp 21–.
Said and done
Here you will find what the member has said and done in the Riksdag. This can apply to motions, speeches in the chamber or interpellations and written questions to the government. Here you will also find what the government's ministers have said and done in the Riksdag. Use the filters to find among the documents.
Svensk bnp-tillväxt
Skriftlig fråga 2018/19:1 av Dennis Dioukarev (SD)
Fråga 2018/19:1 Svensk bnp-tillväxt av Dennis Dioukarev SD till Finansminister Magdalena Andersson S I dagarna publicerade IMF sin prognos över utvecklingen i världsekonomin. Där finns siffror över tillväxten i respektive land mätt som bnp per capita, ett mått som de rödgröna partierna inte talat mycket om under sin tid- Inlämnad
- 2018-10-10
- Besvarare
- Finansminister Magdalena Andersson (S)