Christina Höj Larsen (Lft)
Tidigare riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Left Party
- Constituency
- Västernorrland County
- Birth year
- 1971
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2010-10-4 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2012-3-20
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-16 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2018-10-2 – 2021-10-22
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
- Deputy member
- 2012-3-12 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-14 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2021-10-19 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2021-10-18
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 10-. Suppleant socialförsäkringsutskottet 10-, miljö- och jordbruksutskottet 10-12, arbetsmarknadsutskottet 10-, utrikesutskottet 12-14 och näringsutskottet 14-18.
Föräldrar
Metallarbetaren Bjarne Larsen och läkarsekreteraren Susanne Howalt Larsen, f. Höj.
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Talesperson flykting- och migrationspolitiska frågor för Vänsterpartiet.
Bostadsort
Härnösand
Said and done
Here you will find what the member has said and done in the Riksdag. This can apply to motions, speeches in the chamber or interpellations and written questions to the government. Here you will also find what the government's ministers have said and done in the Riksdag. Use the filters to find among the documents.
Utredning om andra boendeformer än HVB-hem för ensamkommande flyktingbarn
Skriftlig fråga 2012/13:487 av Höj Larsen, Christina (V)
den 3 maj Fråga 2012/13:487 Utredning om andra boendeformer än HVB-hem för ensamkommande flyktingbarn av Christina Höj Larsen V till statsrådet Tobias Billström M För ett år sedan förordade migrationsminister Tobias Billström en utredning av andra boendeformer för ensamkommande flyktingbarn än de nuvarande HVB-hemmen.- Inlämnad
- 2013-05-03
- Besvarare
- Tobias Billström (M)
Rättssäkerheten i migrationsdomstolarna
Skriftlig fråga 2012/13:332 av Höj Larsen, Christina (V)
den 21 februari Fråga 2012/13:332 Rättssäkerheten i migrationsdomstolarna av Christina Höj Larsen V till statsrådet Tobias Billström M En granskning som Jusektidningen gjort visar stora skillnader i hur landets olika migrationsdomstolar hanterat asylfall under perioden 2006 till 2012. Störst visade sig skillnaderna- Inlämnad
- 2013-02-21
- Besvarare
- Tobias Billström (M)