Camilla Waltersson Grönvall (Mod)
Statsråd
- Party
- The Moderate Party
- Constituency
- Västra Götaland County West, seat 299
- Title
- Lärare.
- Birth year
- 1969
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Off duty
The Ministry of Health and Social Affairs
Minister
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Off duty
- 2022-10-18 – 2026-9-21
- Ordinary member
- 2010-10-4 – 2022-10-18
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2014-12-19 – 2017-10-13
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2014-12-18
- Member
- 2012-10-19 – 2014-9-29
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2012-10-18
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2022-10-18
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2017-10-13 – 2018-9-24
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2015-12-18
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Deputy member
- 2010-10-12 – 2014-9-29
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-10-4
Council for Members' Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-12 – 2022-10-18
The Ministry of Health and Social Affairs
- Minister
- 2022-10-18 – 2026-9-21
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 10–. Ledamot utbildningsutskottet 12–17 och socialutskottet 17–22. Suppleant utbildningsutskottet 10–12, justitieutskottet 10–14 och socialutskottet 14–15. Suppleant ledamotsrådet 22. Statsråd (socialtjänstminister), Socialdepartementet 221018–.
Föräldrar
Elektrikern och egenföretagaren Rolf Waltersson och kontoristen och egenföretagaren Mona Waltersson, f. Haga.
Utbildning
Gymnasieskola, humanistisk linje, slutår 89. Grundskollärarutbildning, Karlstad och Göteborg 93–99.
Anställningar
Trollhättans kommun 98–.
Uppdrag inom statliga myndigheter m.m.
Ersättare, Polisstyrelsen, Västra Götaland 06–10.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Lilla Edets kommun 95–. Ledamot, kommunstyrelsen 98–10, ersättare 96–98. Ersättare och ledamot, socialnämnden 93–98. Ledamot utbildningsnämnden 97–98, vice ordförande 98–02, ordförande 02–10. Ledamot, Göteborgsregionens utbildningsgrupp 94–98 och 06–10. Ledamot, SKL:s utbildningsberedning 02–10.
Bostadsort
Lilla Edet