Åsa Westlund (SocDem)
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Constituency
- Stockholm County, seat 55
- Title
- Fil.mag.
- Birth year
- 1976
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
- Telephone
- 08-786 58 74
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
Committee on Education
Deputy Chair
The Bank of Sweden Tercentenary Foundation
Member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2016-5-1 – 2026-9-21
- Off duty
- 2015-11-1 – 2016-4-30
- Ordinary member
- 2014-9-29 – 2015-10-31
European Parliament
- Member
- 2004-7-20 – 2014-7-1
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Chair
- 2018-3-27 – 2018-9-24
- Member
- 2018-3-22 – 2018-3-27
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-3-22
Committee on Finance
- Chair
- 2020-10-15 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2020-10-14 – 2020-10-14
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-10-14
Committee on Education
- Deputy Chair
- 2022-10-4 – 2026-9-21
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2022-10-4
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-3-22
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-10-16 – 2022-10-4
- Chair
- 2018-10-3 – 2020-10-15
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2018-10-3
- Deputy member
- 2014-10-7 – 2014-12-17
The War Delegation
- Member
- 2020-10-14 – 2022-10-9
- Member
- 2018-3-23 – 2018-10-9
Advisory Council on Foreign Affairs
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2022-10-19
- Member
- 2018-10-9 – 2022-10-2
The Riksdag Board
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2022-10-11
The General Council of the Riksbank
- Member
- 2022-10-11 – 2022-10-19
The Bank of Sweden Tercentenary Foundation
- Member
- 2022-11-1 –
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 14–. Ledamot näringsutskottet 14–18. Ordförande miljö- och jordbruksutskottet 18, EU-nämnden 18–20 och finansutskottet 20–22. Vice ordförande utbildningsutskottet 22–. Suppleant miljö- och jordbruksutskottet 14–18 och EU-nämnden 14. Ledamot Krigsdelegationen 18 och Utrikesnämnden 18–22. Ledamot Europaparlamentet 04–14.
Föräldrar
Fil.kand. Bo Westlund och läraren Gunilla Westlund, f. Landin.
Utbildning
Fil.mag., statsvetenskap, 00. Juridikstudier, Göteborgs universitet 97–01.
Anställningar
Politiskt sakkunnig, Utbildningsdepartementet 01. Förbundsordförande, S-studenter 01–03. Politisk sekreterare, Socialdemokraternas partistyrelse 03–.
Uppdrag inom statliga myndigheter m.m.
Ledamot, Grundlagsutredningen 04–07. Ledamot, Energikommissionen 15–17. Särskild utredare, Biogasmarknadsutredningen 18–19. Ledamot, Styrelsen för Stiftelsen Riksbankens Jubileumsfond 22–.
Kommunala uppdrag
Kommunfullmäktig, Haninge 14–. Ersättare, landstingsfullmäktige, Stockholms län 02–04. Ersättare, hälso- och sjukvårdsnämnd 5, Västra Götalandsregionen 99–01. Ledamot, socialnämnden och i dess arbets- och socialutskott, Haninge kommun 02–03. Ersättare, regionplan- och trafiknämnden, Stockholms län 02–04.
Uppdrag inom förenings- och näringsliv
Adjungerad ledamot, Göteborgs socialdemokratiska partidistrikts styrelse 99–01. Ordförande, Göteborgs socialdemokratiska högskoleförening 99–01. Ledamot, Sveriges förenade studentkårers styrelse 99–00. Ledamot, Göteborgs studentkommittés styrelse 98–99. Ledamot, Filosofiska fakulteternas studentkår Göteborg 98–01 och vice ordförande 98–99. Ledamot, FNSU:s styrelse 01–03. Adjungerad ledamot, Socialdemokratiska partistyrelsen 01–03. Styrelseledamot, Sveriges socialdemokratiska studentförbund 00–01 och förbundsordförande 01–03. Styrelseledamot, Young European Socialists, YES 00–03 och samordnare, kvinnonätverket i YES 02–03. Adjungerad ledamot, Socialdemokraternas verkställande utskott 03. Adjungerad ledamot, Stockholms läns socialdemokratiska partidistrikts styrelse 04–16. Ledamot, Socialdemokraternas partistyrelse 13–. Ersättare, Stockholms läns socialdemokratiska partidistrikts styrelse 16–20, ordförande 20–.