Angelika Bengtsson (SweDem)
Tjänstgörande riksdagsledamot
- Party
- The Sweden Democrats
- Constituency
- City of Stockholm, seat 80
- Birth year
- 1990
- Address
- Sveriges riksdag, 100 12 Stockholm
Current assignments
Member of Parliament
Ordinary member
Committee on Cultural Affairs
Deputy member
Committee on Foreign Affairs
Deputy member
Committee on European Union Affairs
Deputy member
Member
The Swedish Delegation to the Nordic Council
Member
All assignments
Member of Parliament
- Ordinary member
- 2024-9-1 – 2026-9-21
- Off duty
- 2024-1-16 – 2024-8-31
- Ordinary member
- 2014-9-29 – 2024-1-15
Committee on Cultural Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2023-9-20 – 2026-9-21
- Member
- 2022-10-4 – 2023-9-20
- Member
- 2018-10-2 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2014-10-7 – 2018-9-24
Committee on Health and Welfare
- Member
- 2023-12-18 – 2024-9-11
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-12 – 2023-12-18
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on the Constitution
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Foreign Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2024-9-11 – 2026-9-21
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-12 – 2023-11-28
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2020-9-3
Committee on Justice
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Environment and Agriculture
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Industry and Trade
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Social Insurance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Taxation
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Transport and Communications
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Education
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Defence
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2020-9-3
Committee on the Labour Market
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Civil Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
Committee on Finance
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-20 – 2022-9-26
- Member
- 2022-10-26 –
- Deputy member
- 2018-3-13 – 2018-5-24
Committee on European Union Affairs
- Deputy member
- 2022-10-12 –
- Deputy member
- 2020-3-18 – 2022-10-4
The Swedish Delegation to the Nordic Council
- Member
- 2018-10-9 – 2024-10-31
- Deputy member
- 2016-9-29 – 2018-10-9
The Riksdag Delegation to the Inter-Parliamentary Union
- Member
- 2023-4-18 – 2024-1-16
The Swedish Delegation to the Parliamentary Assembly of the Council of Europe
- Deputy member
- 2018-11-1 – 2018-12-14
Biography
The information in the biography is information that the commissioner has submitted to the publication Fakta om folkvalda.
Uppdrag inom riksdag och regering
Riksdagsledamot 14–. Ledamot kulturutskottet 14– och socialutskottet 23–. Suppleant sammansatta civil- och kulturutskottet 18, socialutskottet 22–23, utrikesutskottet 22–23 och EU-nämnden 22–. Ledamot, Nordiska rådets svenska delegation 18–. Suppleant, Nordiska rådets svenska delegation 14–18 och Europarådets svenska delegation 18.